HI SB950 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 046, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Updates requirements relating to licensed mortgage servicers by requiring approval by the commissioner of financial institutions for a change in control; and clarifying which persons associated with a mortgage servicer are presumed to exercise control and are subject to interviews, examination, and disclosure requirements. Effective 9/1/2017. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mortgage Servicers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateAct 046, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2017-06-22HouseAct 046, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61).
2017-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; S. Chang.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Choy Co-Chairs; Ward.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 494).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2017-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-24HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318), recommending referral to FIN.
2017-03-22HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto.
2017-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
2017-03-17HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
2017-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 304) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2017-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
2017-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-02-13SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani.
2017-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-25SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1084 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback