HI SB947 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB947
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for the cost of upgrading or converting a qualified cesspool to a director of health-approved wastewater system or connecting to a sewerage system. Requires certain information regarding cesspools on real property to be included in seller mandatory disclosures on real property transactions.
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM/CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB947 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM/CPN.
HB440 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB440 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=947&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB947_.HTM |