HI SB947 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii broadband and digital equity office within the department of business, economic development, and tourism. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To A Broadband And Digital Equity Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2021-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-18SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1251 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback