HI SB945 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB945

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Dedicates a minimum of twenty-five per cent of the State's operating budget each fiscal year beginning with the 2020-2021 fiscal year to the department of education for all K-12 education related expenses, including but not limited to payments for staff fringe benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-29SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU/LCA, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB945 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback