HI SB945 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB945
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates a minimum of twenty-five per cent of the State's operating budget each fiscal year beginning with the 2020-2021 fiscal year to the department of education for all K-12 education related expenses, including but not limited to payments for staff fringe benefits.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB945 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=945&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB945_.HTM |