HI SB938 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to adopt reasonable standards to allow the construction of up to four dwelling units on any land with an urban state land use district classification that is zoned for residential use where a single-family dwelling unit is permitted.
Title
Relating To Housing Capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB938 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM/HOU/WTL, WAM.
HB672 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB672 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=938&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB938_.HTM |