HI SB929 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for timely review by the public utilities commission in its decision-making process regarding proposed renewable energy projects. Requires timely completion of the interconnection process by electric public utilities. Allows electric public utilities and developers to agree to extend the timely completion of the interconnection process. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB560 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB929 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
SB929 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.