HI SB925 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for the fetal alcohol spectrum disorder coordinator position in the family services division of the department of health. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder; Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder Coordinator; Family Health Services; Department of Health; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |