HI SB916 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires HCDA to establish rules to require reserved and workforce housing in developments. Amends definition of reserved housing and creates definition of workforce housing. Provides for establishing rules for the rental of reserved and workforce housing.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Affordable Housing; Reserved Housing; Workforce Housing; Affordable Workforce Housing
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-12-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1020 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=916&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB916_.HTM |