HI SB910 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes department of education employees and agents with specified training to volunteer to administer auto-injectable epinephrine to a student with anaphylaxis. Allows the department of education to make arrangements to receive auto-injectable epinephrine supplies from manufacturers and suppliers. Establishes a five-year auto-injectable epinephrine pilot program within the department of education and requires annual reports to the legislature regarding the pilot program. Appropriates funds to the department of education to acquire training and supplies necessary for compliance with this Act.
Title
Department of Education; Department of Health; Administration of Auto-injectable Epinephrine; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=910&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB910_.HTM |