HI SB908 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB908
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Statewide Sustainability Division within the Office of Planning to ensure long-term planning, coordination, and implementation of Hawaii's sustainability goals and policies. Appropriates funds. (SB908 HD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, L. Thielen, Riviere Co-Chairs; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 549). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1968), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1677) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-19 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB908 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
HB449 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Re-Referred to EET/WTL/GVO, WAM.
HB449 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Re-Referred to EET/WTL/GVO, WAM.