HI SB904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB904
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits medical malpractice liability for residents and fellows in accredited residency and fellowship programs acting under the supervision of a licensed physician.
Title
Relating To Medical Malpractice.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HRE, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE/CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB904 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/HRE, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=904&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB904_.HTM |