HI SB896 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB896
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the list of federal agencies whose officers may make arrests for certain offenses under state law by adding the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and removing the Citizenship and Immigration Services from the list. Adds proper titles of the heads of the district offices for the listed federal agencies.
Title
Relating To The Power Of Arrest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB896 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB1030 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1030 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=896&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB896_.HTM |