HI SB893 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB893
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, LBR.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, LBR.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the nonprofit corporations law to: restore procedures that allow nonprofit corporations to convert into and out of domestic nonprofit corporations; impose a duty of loyalty on directors and officers of nonprofit corporations; prohibit a director from voting on any matter in which the director has a conflict; and increase the length of time the attorney general has to review proposed dissolutions of public benefit corporations. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Nonprofit Corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, LBR. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |