HI SB887 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "industrial park" to include broadband cable landing and connectivity infrastructure facility development. Requires the board of directors of the high technology development corporation to establish advisory subcommittees to make recommendations to the board. Requires a report to the governor and the legislature in 2016 regarding the formation of the sub-committees and their plans to develop industrial parks in conjunction with broadband cable landing and connectivity infrastructure facilities. (SB887 HD1)
Title
High Technology Development Corporation; Broadband Cable; Advisory Subcommittees; Report
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:46PM in Conference Room 423. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:35PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ohno, Yamashita, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; English Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Espero, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 551). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1541), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-17-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on EDT has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |