HI SB880 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee(s) on HWN/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-22 1:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee(s) on HWN/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-22 1:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts any housing development for the department of Hawaiian home lands from the school impact fee requirement.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-22 1:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB880 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=880&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB880_.HTM |