HI SB879 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a civil violation subject to a fine of $100 for intentional or knowing possession of one ounce or less of marijuana. Amends the offense of promoting a detrimental drug in the third degree to clarify that the offense applies to the knowing possession of more than one ounce of marijuana. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Marijuana; Possession of Marijuana; Civil Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Slom . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Kouchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |