HI SB877 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the One Call Center pilot program, which facilitates advance warnings to excavators of the location of underground facilities. Exempts pest control operations from the program. (SB877 HD1)
Title
The One Call Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-09 2:15pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hee. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1059 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 15