HI SB868 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB868
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates income brackets for the low-income renter tax credit. Provides for adjustment of the tax credit amount based on the consumer price index for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021, and beyond. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Low-income Household Renters Credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB868 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.