HI SB859 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to establish and fund one advanced life support ambulance based in Makalei on the island of Hawaii, including acquisition of a vehicle, equipment, and personnel costs.
Title
Relating To Ambulances.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB859 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=859&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB859_.HTM |