HI SB856 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each member of a cooperative housing corporation board of directors, planned community association board of directors, and condominium association board to attend a training and certification course provided by the Real Estate Commission within one year of appointment or election or one year of the effective date of the Act. Requires the Real Estate Commission to establish and administer a training and certification program to ensure that every board member understands the member's legal and fiduciary obligations pursuant to chapters 421I, 421J, and 514B, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Property Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
HB299 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB299 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=856&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB856_.HTM |