HI SB856 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to create a plan to incorporated modern computed tomography equipment at Kau Hospital by July 1, 2023. Requires a report to be delivered to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2022.
Title
Relating To Medical Equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=856&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB856_.HTM |