HI SB848 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that 0.5 per cent, rather than one per cent, of state fund appropriations for capital improvements shall be transferred into the works of art special fund. Limits the 0.5 per cent amount to appropriations designated for the construction of new state buildings, properties, or facilities.
Title
Relating To Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB848 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
HB373 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB373 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=848&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB848_.HTM |