HI SB848 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the July 1, 2009 "sunset" date in Act 53, SLH 2008, that established the misdemeanor offense of theft of beer keg and imposed recordkeeping requirements on scrap metal dealers that purchase beer kegs. Removes sunset clause in Act 197, Session Laws of Hawaii 2007, which contains a repeal date of July 1, 2009. Effective June 30, 2009. (SB848 HD1)
Title
Metal; Beer Kegs; Copper; Scrap Dealer; Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 718). | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Senator(s) Baker added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 713). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Takamine, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Ito Co-Chairs; Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 476). | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-09. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 383). | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Luke, Takai excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday04-06-09. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Thielen. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-09 2:15pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26 | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 9:00am in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1030 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.