HI SB843 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals provisions of Chapters 302A and 302L, Hawaii Revised Statutes, as related to early childhood education, for housekeeping and other purposes.
Title
Early Childhood Education; Housekeeping
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB821 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - Act 108, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=843&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB843_.HTM |