HI SB834 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB834
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires LRB to conduct a feasibility study that includes the costs associated with the implementation of audiovisual technology in both chambers of the legislature. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Videoconferencing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 270) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Tokuda. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT/GVO, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Audiovisual Technology
Legislative Hearings
LRB Study
Neighbor Islands
Teleconferencing
Testimony
Videoconferencing
Audiovisual Technology
Legislative Hearings
LRB Study
Neighbor Islands
Teleconferencing
Testimony
Videoconferencing