HI SB834 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides voting rights to the high school student member of the board of education and gives the governor authority to select the student member from a list of nominees compiled by the state student council.
Title
Board of Education; Student Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=834&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB834_.HTM |