HI SB83 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November 28 of each year as La Kuokoa, Hawaiian Recognition Day, not constituting a state holiday, to celebrate the historical recognition of independence of the kingdom of Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 75) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/WAM. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to GVO. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to GVO. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB83 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).