HI SB827 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB827
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts Hawaiian language immersion program students from kindergarten assessment requirements.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Language Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/EDU/HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB962 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB827 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM.
SB827 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=827&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB827_.HTM |