HI SB824 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB824
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-04-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-04-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the securing of mooring lines from vessels requiring tug assistance to be manned by an existing, operational stevedoring company that is operating within the State, except the securing of mooring lines from vessels for purposes of shipyard or boatyard operations necessary for vessel drydocking, hauling, launching, or shifting used in conjunction with other shipyard or boatyard operations. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Mooring Lines.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-04-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-04-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-23 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-23. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-14-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 280) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Elefante. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM . |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB824 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-04-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
HB714 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
HB714 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).