HI SB824 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 298, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1415).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 298, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1415).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deems void and unenforceable any provision of a motor carrier transportation services contract or agreement that requires a motor carrier to indemnify, defend, or hold harmless the indemnitee from any liability for the indemnitee's negligence or intentional acts or omissions. (CD1)
Title
Motor Carriers; Transportation Services; Indemnification
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 298, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1415). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 298, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1415). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 706). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 813). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Fukunaga. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-26-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5-12). | |
2012-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Ichiyama, Yamane, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Herkes, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Yamane, Fontaine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 400). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:30PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Saiki. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 198) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to TIA, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |