HI SB815 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB815
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an accelerator program within the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation. Amends the reporting requirements for Hawaii Technology Development Corporation's manufacturing and development program. Requires the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to submit annual reports to the Legislature regarding the outcomes of the research and development program.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB815 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=815&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB815_.HTM |