HI SB810 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HMS/WTL/TSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HMS/WTL/TSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii children's legacy trust fund as a separate fund of a nonprofit entity to encourage individuals to make strong financial investments while supporting conservation, reforestation, environmental stewardship, sustainability, affordable housing, public education, and the well-being of the State's keiki and kupuna. Establishes an income tax refund check-off box for the Hawaii children's legacy trust fund. Establishes an eco-tourism program in the department of land and natural resources. Creates a process for local businesses and individuals to purchase native or food-bearing trees to be planted on state-owned land.
Title
Department of Land and Natural Resources; Hawaii Children's Legacy Trust Fund; Native Trees; Food-bearing Trees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/WTL/TSM, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/WTL/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=810&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB810_.HTM |