HI SB810 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to establish high school diploma requirements that aim to establish college and career readiness. Requires the department of education to report to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2012. (SD1)
Title
College and Career Readiness; Diploma
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Chang, Hanohano. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-21-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Taniguchi. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |