HI SB808 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 171, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation from the special land and development fund to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the operational expenses and staffing costs of the Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Association Of Conservation Districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 171, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
2017-07-12SenateAct 171, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 157) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 157).
2017-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 476).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
2017-03-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
2017-03-30HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
2017-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-03-21HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-03-17HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen.
2017-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-17-17 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 267) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2017-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-02-17SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads K., Gabbard, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Thielen L..
2017-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB785 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback