HI SB808 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Hawaii teacher cadet program.
Title
Education; Teacher Cadet Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 2:30 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=808&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB808_.HTM |