HI SB805 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in real property transactions based on lawful source of income.
Title
Discrimination in Real Property Transactions; Source of Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB676 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=805&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB805_.HTM |