HI SB803 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a terminally ill, competent adult to receive medication to end life. Prohibits mercy killings, lethal injections, and active euthanasia. Requires informed consent. Allows alternate doctor to replace attending doctor if latter declines to prescribe. Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for acts taken in good faith. Imposes penalties for unauthorized altering, forging, concealing, destroying, or exerting undue influence in making or rescinding a request for medication. Requires monitor at time of taking dose.
Title
Death With Dignity
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 2:45PM in conference room AUDITORIUM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=803 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB803_.HTM |