HI SB80 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB80

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an emergency appropriation to finance the relocation of transmission facilities for the "I Heart Radio" aerial. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2018-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-21HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
2018-03-21HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-14HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2018-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2018-02-16SenateReported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2018-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 1:25PM in conference room 225.
2018-02-09SenateRe-Referred to TRE, WAM.
2018-02-09SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to TRE.
2018-02-09SenateReported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2156) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to TRE.
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2018-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-18 9:00AM in conference room 225.
2018-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on TRE will hold a public decision making on 02-07-18 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2018-02-07HouseReceived from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 6).
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-20SenateReferred to TRE.
2017-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB80 (Carry Over) 2017-01-20 - Referred to TRE.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback