HI SB790 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB790
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the department of the attorney general a child abuse investigation unit. Allows the department of the attorney general to intervene in adjudications in family court. Enacts the Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act, which authorizes courts to allow for children to testify in a place other than an open forum or away from the finder of fact, court, or parties. Requires the court and the prosecution to take appropriate action to ensure a prompt trial in order to minimize the length of time a child abuse victim or minor witness must endure the stress of the child's involvement in the proceedings.
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB790 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
HB806 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB806 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Attorney General
Child Abuse
Expedited Criminal Proceedings
Investigation Unit
Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act
Child Abuse
Expedited Criminal Proceedings
Investigation Unit
Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=790&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB790_.HTM |