HI SB790 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases access to provider orders for life-sustaining treatment by expanding health care provider signatory authority to include physician assistants. (SD1)
Title
Physician Assistant; Provider Orders for Life-sustaining Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |