HI SB787 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB787
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that revenue estimates provided by the department of taxation to the legislature or to any executive or administrative office be accompanied by a description of the methodology used and assumptions made in providing the estimate. Requires the estimate and description to be subject to public disclosure. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 272) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB787 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22