HI SB777 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB777
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023, provides a temporary income tax credit for the cost of upgrading or converting a qualified cesspool to a wastewater system approved by the Director of Health, or connecting to a sewerage system. Sunsets 12/31/2028. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Perruso. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB777 (Carry Over) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).