HI SB777 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a prompt payment task force attached to DAGS to examine and resolve issues relating to state agencies' payments for goods and services purchased through nonprofit organizations. Effective 07/01/2112. (HD1)
Title
Public Money; Payment for Goods and Services; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Brower. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-22-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Referred to ERB, LMG, referral sheet 31 | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (English, Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-11. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Espero, Kouchi. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-11 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |