HI SB771 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB771

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that theft of a bicycle constitutes theft in the second degree, a class C felony. Adds the definition of "bicycle" and "toy bicycle" to section 708-800, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB771 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback