HI SB771 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB771
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who lease housing to certain low-income tenants. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB800 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB800 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.