HI SB757 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB757
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies to maintain a website with a list of open non-confidential contested cases. (SB757 HD1)
Title
Relating To Administrative Procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1574), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1361) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 234) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB757 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB274 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB274 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).