HI SB756 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Access to Local Food Act to allow cottage food operations to sell cottage food products, under certain conditions, upon receiving a permit from the Department of Health. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Rhoads. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB520 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB756 (Carry Over) 2023-03-15 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB756 (Carry Over) 2023-03-15 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.