HI SB738 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires beekeepers to register with the department of agriculture, with the information to be kept confidential; requires report to the 2013 legislature.
Title
Beekeeping; Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to AGL, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=738 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB738_.HTM |