HI SB737 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 670).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 670).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards, including authorization for the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules, for check cashing businesses, including requirements for registration, surety, recordkeeping, examinations, and confidentiality. Sets new penalties for check cashing businesses that violate the established standards. (SB737 HD2)
Title
Check Cashing; Deferred Deposit Agreements; Fees; Annual Percentage Rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Nishihara. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kawakami, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: DeCoite, Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti, Oshiro, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-03-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:40PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-25-15. |
2015-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB744 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.